WHITEPARISH EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintenance of Whiteparish Village School and provision of other educational benefits for the benefit of boys and girls resident in the Parish of Whiteparish
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 05 November 1962: Standard registration
- WHITEPARISH EDUCATIONAL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Linda Anne Palmer | Chair | 08 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Parlane CAMPBELL | Trustee | 31 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Andrew Thorne | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kingsley Graham Lee | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR PAXTON KING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.82k | £4.92k | £5.18k | £5.25k | £5.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.07k | £2.49k | £2.01k | £3.92k | £1.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 11TH JUNE 1908 VARIED BY SCHEME DATED 18TH OCTOBER 1967 AS AMENDED ON 15 MAR 2018 as amended on 06 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
1. THE TRUSTEES MAY PAY SUCH OF EARLY SUM AS THEY THINK FIT TO THE MANAGERS OF THE WHITEPARISH CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL TO BE APPLIED TOWARDS THE COST OF ALTERATIONS AND REPAIRS TO THE SCHOOL. 2. THE RESIDUE OF THE NET INCOME SHALL BE APPLIED BY THE TRUSTEES IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS FOR THE BENEFIT OF BOYS AND GIRLS RESIDENT IN BENEFICIAL AREA WHO, IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES, ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE. (A) EXHIBITIONS OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY SECONDARY SCHOOL, TECHNICAL COLLEGE FOR TEACHERS, UNIVERSITY, OR OTHER INSTITUTION OF FURTHER (INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL AND TECHNICAL) EDUCATION APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES. TO BE AWARDED UNDER RULES TO BE MADE BY THE TRUSTEES, INCLUDING RULES AS TO THE VALUE AND PERIOD OF TENURE OF THE EXHIBITIONS, AND THE QUALIFICATIONS, AND METHOD OF ASCERTAINMENT AND SELECTION OF CANDIDATES. (B) FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO HELP BENEFICIARIES ON LEAVING SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR ANY OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT, TO PREPARE FOR, OR TO ENTER A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING. (C) OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF BENEFICIARIES.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF WHITEPARISH
Contact information
- Address:
-
58 HIGHLANDS WAY
WHITEPARISH
SALISBURY
SP5 2SZ
- Phone:
- 01794884737
- Email:
- palmerlinda58@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window