Trustees RICHARD JONES FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 309461
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Katherine Wilson Trustee 25 May 2023
None on record
Patricia Farrow Trustee 25 May 2023
None on record
Fiona Holness Trustee 09 June 2022
None on record
STEPHEN RICHARD WALLS Trustee 15 May 2021
None on record
PETER JOHN ROBERTS Trustee 26 February 2019
None on record
Peter Donald Crockett Trustee 22 September 2016
None on record