BISHOP WORDSWORTH'S TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Parental contributions to help enable the school to provide additional resources in support of excellence in education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 12 December 1962: Standard registration
- 07 January 2016: Removed (Voluntary removal)
- BISHOP WORDSWORTH'S SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Andrew Harmsworth | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Julia Nadine Cox | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Noah Williams | Trustee | 17 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rupert Blake | Trustee | 17 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barry Leonard Smith | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £165.34k | £111.14k | £105.15k | £137.28k | £103.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £143.85k | £165.54k | £138.60k | £30.25k | £22.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 30 SEP 2021 as amended on 07 May 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 THROUGH: (1) THE PROVISION OF ITEMS, SERVICES AND FACILITIES FOR THE SCHOOL; (2) GIVING GRANTS, BURSARIES OR OTHER PAYMENTS TO BENEFICIARIES WHO ARE IN FINANCIAL NEED INCLUDING: (A) TO ENABLE THEM TO CONTINUE THEIR EDUCATION IN ANY MANNER APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES (INCLUDING ATTENDANCE AT ANY SCHOOL, COLLEGE, UNIVERSITY OR OTHER PLACE OF LEARNING); AND (B) IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL OR OTHER ASSISTANCE TO THEM TO ASSIST THEIR ENTRY INTO A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING OR TO ENABLE THEM TO TRAVEL ABROAD TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 12 December 1962 : Standard registration
- 07 January 2016 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bishop Wordsworths School
Exeter Street
SALISBURY
SP1 2ED
- Phone:
- 01722333851
- Email:
- bls@bws.wilts.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window