Financial history ST MARY'S SCHOOL (CALNE)

Charity number: 309482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £19.55m £15.95m £16.60m £17.11m £18.72m
Total expenditure £14.85m £15.45m £16.31m £17.51m £17.88m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £4.40m £504.77k £390.34k £257.34k £437.39k
Income - Other trading activities £453.62k £323.65k £604.97k £652.93k £693.83k
Income - Charitable activities £14.06m £14.69m £15.58m £16.10m £17.44m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £29.85k £20.39k £25.18k £102.92k £157.16k
Income - Other £604.05k £409.85k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £14.00m £14.66m £15.30m £16.43m £16.80m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £788.42k £1.01m £1.08m £1.08m
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £78.38k £68.11k £86.89k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £788.42k £12.13k £11.67k £13.16k
Expenditure - Other £847.45k £0 £0 £0 £0