MARLBOROUGH COLLEGE

Charity number: 309486
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Marlborough College is incorporated by Royal Charter and registered as an education charity. The College provides education for boys and girls for the ages 13-18. The number of pupils in the College averaged 924 of whom 888 were boarders and 36 were day pupils. Under its grant making policy the total number of pupils receiving fee assistance in the academic year 2014/15 was 119.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Malaysia

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 August 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Heidi Venamore Chair 20 February 2024
None on record
Sarah Joan Thomas Trustee 07 October 2024
ST PAUL'S SCHOOL
Received: On time
Joe Chambers Trustee 09 October 2023
None on record
Kasase Kabwe Trustee 17 June 2023
RIGHT TO PLAY UK LIMITED
Received: On time
Michael Birkin Trustee 19 March 2022
MARLBOROUGH COLLEGE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Ros King Trustee 19 March 2022
None on record
Sabina Reeves Trustee 19 March 2022
None on record
Peter Denton Trustee 12 June 2021
None on record
Professor Simon Mordant AO Trustee 12 June 2021
None on record
Tania Freeman Trustee 01 May 2021
None on record
Timothy MARTIN-JENKINS Trustee 18 April 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £59.98m £56.42m £52.05m £55.47m £74.45m
Total expenditure £54.79m £57.93m £50.89m £52.34m £61.55m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.41m £677.00k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.13m £3.49m £1.58m £1.19m £15.33m
Income - Other trading activities £1.43m £945.00k £1.06m £1.29m £1.34m
Income - Charitable activities £55.14m £49.83m £47.91m £51.23m £55.48m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.22m £875.00k £640.00k £879.00k £1.31m
Income - Other £1.06m £1.28m £867.00k £885.00k £989.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £6.80k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £49.77m £52.96m £46.50m £46.54m £56.02m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.04m £1.09m £1.06m £1.10m £1.39m
Expenditure - Governance £72.00k £124.00k £122.00k £127.00k £160.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £58.00k £58.00k £66.00k £70.00k £61.00k
Expenditure - Other £3.98m £3.88m £3.33m £4.70m £4.14m

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets £141.28m £135.37m £133.89m £146.24m £147.05m
Long-term investments £15.76m £15.76m £18.28m £16.41m £25.87m
Other assets £33.10m £31.23m £32.03m £31.22m £32.86m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£3.62m -£3.37m -£3.04m -£2.90m -£2.53m
Total liabilities £82.62m £77.24m £75.30m £85.02m £84.97m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 07 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 07 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 03 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 03 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 23 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME SEALED 26 FEBRUARY 1957
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF KEITH RAE EXHIBITIONS: FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 20 August 1997 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
MARLBOROUGH COLLEGE
MARLBOROUGH
SN8 1PA
Phone:
01672892390