Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ETON WICK SCHOOL

Charity number: 309540
Charity reporting is up to date (249 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 06 March 2025 249 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 06 March 2025 249 days late
Annual return 31 August 2022 12 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 02 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 18 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required