THE ST MICHAEL'S OXFORD EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 309553
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The promotion of education in accordance with the principles of the Church of England. Beneficiaries are young people who have not attained the age of 25 years who are resident or who work in the neighbourhood of the City of Oxford.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £2,836
Total expenditure: £1,860

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 November 1966: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nigel Clifford Trustee 01 September 2024
THE ST MICHAELS AND ALL SAINTS CHARITY
Received: On time
CHURCH HOUSES RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
KEITH MURRAY AWARD FUND
Received: On time
LINCOLN 2027 TRUST
Received: On time
Professor Andrew Spicer Trustee 15 May 2024
THE ST MICHAELS AND ALL SAINTS CHARITY
Received: On time
CHURCH HOUSES RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST. MICHAEL AT THE NORTHGATE CHURCH
Received: On time
Daniel Martin Thomas Mr Trustee 07 July 2022
None on record
Matthew Lebus Trustee 28 October 2020
Oxford Food Hub
Received: On time
THE ST MICHAELS AND ALL SAINTS CHARITY
Received: On time
CHURCH HOUSES RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST. MICHAEL AT THE NORTHGATE CHURCH
Received: On time
Rev ANTHONY BUCKLEY Trustee 09 January 2019
CHURCH HOUSES RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
THE ST MICHAELS AND ALL SAINTS CHARITY
Received: On time
Myriam Tamara Burstow Trustee 31 January 2017
None on record
PROF SIR NIGEL SHADBOLT FRS FREng Trustee 01 August 2015
WEB SCIENCE TRUST
Received: On time
JESUS COLLEGE WITHIN THE UNIVERSITY AND CITY OF OXFORD OF QUEEN ELIZABETH'S FOUNDATION
Received: On time
CHURCH HOUSES RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
THE ST MICHAELS AND ALL SAINTS CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £2.51k £2.54k £2.64k £2.76k £2.84k
Total expenditure £900 £3.00k £750 £1.35k £1.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 24 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 23 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 09 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 10 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 12 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ST MICHAEL'S CHURCH CENTRE
CORNMARKET
OXFORD
OX1 3EY
Phone:
01865255774
Website:

No information available