THE JOHN HAMPDEN WAR MEMORIAL SCHOLARSHIP FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides assistance to existing pupils and past scholars of Lord Williams's School, Thame, normally by way of book grants. Surplus funds are applied to purchase of books/equipment for the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Buckinghamshire
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 20 December 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brett Chowns | Trustee | 29 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
NEIL YEOMANS | Trustee | 05 November 2022 |
|
|||||||
David Lloyd Wybron | Trustee | 31 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher Mark Verdun Caspell | Trustee | 31 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Edward Paul Dore | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||||
PETER MERROW- SMITH | Trustee | 20 November 2011 |
|
|
||||||
JANET MERROW-SMITH | Trustee | 20 November 2011 |
|
|
||||||
BRIDGET CAMPBELL TRUEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
BARRY JAMES YATES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.89k | £12.19k | £12.10k | £20.75k | £16.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.13k | £10.15k | £13.46k | £13.95k | £15.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 November 2021 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 May 2021 | 200 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES (AS ALTERED BY RESOLUTION OF THE OLD TAMENSIAN'S ASSOCIATION ON 30TH JUNE 1947 AND 27TH NOVEMBER 1948)
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF A SCHOLARSHIP OR SCHOLARSHIPS FOR THE BENEFIT OF PAST PUPILS OF LORD WILLIAM'S SCHOOL, THAME, OXON.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
238 Sandon Road
STAFFORD
ST16 3HL
- Phone:
- 01865 980660
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window