STANTON HARCOURT EDUCATIONAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Limited funding of individuals living in Stanton Harcourt and/or allied educational organisations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 13 August 1985: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT LINDSAY BROWN | Chair |
|
||||||
Rev Joanna Hurst | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Claire Amelia Wright | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Maria Clarke | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Matthew Neal Judson | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
DIANE AXFORD | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Prof. David Wallom | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|||||
MICHELLE ARCHER | Trustee | 09 August 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £229 | £331 | £234 | £253 | £254 | |
|
Total expenditure | £55 | £66 | £96 | £75 | £218 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 17 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 13 AUGUST 1985
Charitable objects
INCOME SHALL BE USED IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF STANTON HARCOURT WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE OR TOWARD ASSISTING YOUNG PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH WHO ARE PREPARING FOR ENTERING UPON OR ENGAGING IN ANY PROFESSION, TRADE, OCCUPATION OR SERVICE. IN OR TOWARDS PROMOTING SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KING NOT NORMALLY PROBIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF STANTON HARCOURT
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o 17 BURY MEAD ,
Stanton Harcourt
WITNEY
OX29 5SD
- Phone:
- 01865880130
- Email:
- shcharities@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window