Headington Rye Oxford Limited

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of education for day and boarding pupils. Additionally, the provision of welfare support to pupils' education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£34,968,275
Donations and legacies | £8.02m | |
Charitable activities | £25.89m | |
Other trading activities | £700.54k | |
Investments | £97.14k | |
Other | £255.66k |
Total expenditure:
£25,414,921
Raising funds | £726.00k | |
Charitable activities | £24.69m | |
Other | £0 |
£30,341 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £726.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £24.69m | |
Retained for future use | £9.55m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £726.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £24.69m | |
Retained for future use | £9.58m |
People

413 Employee(s)
14 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 37 |
£70k to £80k | 22 |
£80k to £90k | 11 |
£90k to £100k | 6 |
£100k to £110k | 3 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 2 |
£300k to £350k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 14 January 1966: Standard registration
- 26 June 1996: Removed
- HEADINGTON SCHOOL OXFORD LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Hampshire | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Anup Mysoor | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Shuna McGregor | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carla Stanley | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James JOHNSTON | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE ADDA BOYD | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Jane GARDNER | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Susan Elizabeth Hincks | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|||||
THOMAS SINCLAIR MONTGOMERY | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARK EDWARD CURTIS | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard John James Nicholson | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
KEIRA NICOLE NEWALL | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carol Oster Warriner | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr CATHERINE MARY RINGHAM | Trustee | 04 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.47m | £20.09m | £23.59m | £24.29m | £34.97m | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.51m | £18.73m | £20.66m | £22.55m | £25.41m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £727.23k | £327.03k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £323.96k | £516.07k | £595.60k | £285.38k | £8.02m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £509.57k | £218.67k | £462.24k | £435.67k | £700.54k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £19.61m | £18.64m | £22.07m | £23.14m | £25.89m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £17.54k | £11.94k | £27.57k | £76.42k | £97.14k | |
|
Income - Other | £1.01m | £702.44k | £429.53k | £350.77k | £255.66k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £2.20k | £153.20k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £18.91m | £18.38m | £20.06m | £21.94m | £24.69m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £600.56k | £357.49k | £599.70k | £609.41k | £726.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £98.26k | £85.23k | £86.41k | £248.86k | £165.14k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £2.75k | £3.04k | £0 | £5.33k | £3.44k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £33.54m | £36.29m | £36.49m | £41.24m | £50.10m | |
|
Long-term investments | £315.08k | £513.00k | £755.76k | £1.64m | £307.01k | |
|
Other assets | £1.36m | £1.38m | £2.80m | £1.66m | £7.26m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £8.19m | £9.74m | £8.71m | £11.47m | £15.01m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 23 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 23 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/07/1915 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/01/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/01/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/02/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/12/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/03/2014 as amended on 01 Dec 2023 as amended on 19 Aug 2024
Charitable objects
To advance education for the benefit of the public in any way that the trustees see fit, including the provision, maintenance and support of a school or schools, wherein the core values and teaching shall reflect a broad Christian ethos, but also supporting pupils of all faiths and with none.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- MISS MARRIOTT'S PRIZE FUND
- MISS MARSH'S CURRENT EVENTS PRIZE
- MR HARRISON'S GIFT
- MRS MACDONALDS LATIN PRIZE
- SIXTH FORM SCIENCE PRIZE
- SUMMERHAYES HISTORY PRIZE
- THE DICKENS DOMESTIC SCIENCE PRIZE
- THE FLEXMAN MODERN LANGUAGE PRIZE FUND
- THE GILBERT T GARDNER PRIZE FOR GENERAL KNOWLEDGE
- THE LATE BISHOP OF RIPONS PRIZE FUND
- THE MURPHY TRAVEL AWARD
- THE STEVENS MATHEMATICS PRIZE
- 14 January 1966 : Standard registration
- 26 June 1996 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Bursary
Headington School
Headington
Headington
Oxfordshire
OX3 0BL
- Phone:
- 01865759125
- Email:
- bursar@headington.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window