CHARLES PLATER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust awards grants to organisations for educational projects in line with Catholic social thought and teaching
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 November 1963: Standard registration
- PLATER COLLEGE, OXFORD (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rt Rev Charles Phillip Richard Moth | Chair | 11 November 2021 |
|
|||||||
Philippa Gitlin | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|||||||
Bishop Peter Gwylim Collins | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Laura Maydew-Gale | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Matthew Wall | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Oliver George Eric Smith | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew Francis Haines | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Brian Joseph Mooney | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Paul McAleenan | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||||
MICHAEL THOMAS WALSH | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £255.46k | £166.61k | £221.63k | £201.25k | £147.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £353.17k | £276.18k | £209.87k | £364.41k | £531.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21/06/2006 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 19/08/2008 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 03/02/2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S PROPERTY IS TO BE APPLIED IN SUCH MANNER TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT ('THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES') INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THEIR POWERS) THOSE CONSISTENT WITH THE SOCIAL TEACHING OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 ECCLESTON SQUARE
LONDON
SW1V 1BX
- Phone:
- 02079011900
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window