WILLIAM FOXLEY'S ENDOWED SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support the endowed school in the parish of Blakesley.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 24 October 1962: Standard registration
- THE FOXLEY TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James William Ashby | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Revd Susan Dorothy Margaret Stanley | Trustee | 31 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Trevor Charles Brown | Trustee | 22 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christine Anne Rodhouse | Trustee | 08 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
B EVANS - Chairperson | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COLIN MARRIOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.26k | £17.52k | £23.62k | £27.66k | £35.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.50k | £76.24k | £25.21k | £18.12k | £13.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2023
(These accounts |
16 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHANCERY SCHEME OF 27TH JULY 1850
Charitable objects
A GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOR THE EDUCATION OF THE POORER CLASSES.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF BLAKESLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Manor Cottage
Foxley
TOWCESTER
Northamptonshire
NN12 8HP
- Phone:
- 01327860715
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window