Financial history BLISS'S SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 309842
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £14.97k £14.69k £15.16k £15.28k £8.19k
Total expenditure £15.33k £5.74k £1.62k £1.93k £12.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A