Financial history RICHARD CAPELL'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 309865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.72k £2.76k £3.02k £4.50k £2.97k
Total expenditure £2.07k £2.27k £2.08k £3.67k £2.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A