WILLIAM WALCOT'S FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 309878
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

No activities other than giving money to organisations to allow children to participate in educational activities that have to be paid for ie school trips.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £415
Total expenditure: £379

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 November 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Stephen Jeremy Webster Chair 07 June 2014
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF OUNDLE WITH ASHTON
Received: On time
CHURCH LAND
Received: On time
OUNDLE CHURCH CLOCK FUND
Received: On time
SIR WILLIAM LAXTON'S PENSION CHARITY
Received: On time
PARSON LATHAM'S HOSPITAL IN OUNDLE
Received: On time
Sian Fytche Trustee 12 May 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF OUNDLE WITH ASHTON
Received: On time
OUNDLE CHURCH CLOCK FUND
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £14 £6 £0 £19 £415
Total expenditure £358 £300 £0 £0 £379
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 November 2020 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Parish Office
St. Peters Church
North Street
Oundle
PETERBOROUGH
PE8 4AL
Phone:
01832275675
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available