HOLCOT OLD SCHOOL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing grants to assist young people up to 25 years old in educational activities. Applicants or their parents must be resident in the parish of Holcot, Northamptonshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 15 December 1972: Standard registration
- 09 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 02 October 2009: Standard registration
- 09 February 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 13 April 2012: Re-registered
- 09 February 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
- 06 April 2016: Re-registered
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David Robert Reith | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|||||
David Carr Ashworth | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Hunter | Trustee | 15 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
JAMES EGERTON BONSOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £468 | £484 | £503 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 01 July 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 19 March 2021 | 262 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 22ND SEPTEMBER 1972
Charitable objects
THE INCOME OF THE FOUNDATION SHALL BE APPLIED BY THE TRUSTEES IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PERSONS OF EITHER SEX WHO HAVE NOT ATTAINED THE AGE OF 25 YEARS AND WHO, OR WHOSE PARENTS, ARE RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF HOLCOT.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HOLCOT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wychwood House
Sywell Road
Holcot
NORTHAMPTON
NN6 9SN
- Phone:
- 01604781438
- Email:
- david@sharpend-uk.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window