Governance HOLCOT OLD SCHOOL CHARITY
Charity number: 309897

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 15 December 1972: Standard registration
- 09 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 02 October 2009: Standard registration
- 09 February 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 13 April 2012: Re-registered
- 09 February 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
- 06 April 2016: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.