Financial history KETTERING OLD GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 309903
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £453.04k £247.76k £356.84k £494.97k £516.38k
Total expenditure £553.28k £359.82k £412.59k £550.67k £554.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £75.04k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £182
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £301.51k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £214.69k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £475.12k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £79.03k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £7.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £32.00k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £14.25k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0