NORTHAMPTON OLD GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are:-pay a yearly sum to the Borough Council and the County Council to be applied towards the maintenance of the school. The residue of net yearly income of the Foundation is used for:-The provision of items, services and facilities for the school; and Promoting the education of beneficiaries by the award of prizes, scholarships, bursaries or maintenance allowances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 27 November 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEOFFREY THOMAS MOSS | Chair |
|
|
|||||||||||
Catherine Deans | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Jonathan James William Drown | Trustee | 28 April 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Alan Hakes | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Oliver Harris | Trustee | 25 November 2017 |
|
|||||||||||
Richard Bernard | Trustee | 08 July 2014 |
|
|||||||||||
Joseph Anthony Lavelle | Trustee | 08 July 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||
PAUL MAYNARD | Trustee | 02 August 2012 |
|
|
||||||||||
JOHN THOMAS GEORGE HARRIS | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
ANDREW COCKERILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
PETER BASON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
MARY KAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £409.30k | £348.62k | £674.22k | £381.71k | £401.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £651.61k | £349.65k | £411.13k | £857.51k | £412.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £12.97k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £341.25k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £320.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £351.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £60.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £20.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £300.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £53.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £130 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 24 APRIL 2003.
Charitable objects
"THE SCHOOL" MEANS NORTHAMPTON SCHOOL FOR BOYS. "BENEFICIARIES" MEANS PERSONS NOT EXCEEDING THE AGE OF 25 WHO ARE ABOUT TO ATTEND, ARE ATTENDING OR HAVE AT ANY TIME FOR NOT LESS THAN TWO YEARS, ATTENDED THE SCHOOL, AND WHO, IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES, ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE. THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY: (1) THE PROVISION OF ITEMS, SERVICES AND FACILITIES FOR THE SCHOOL; AND (2) PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF BENEFICIARIES BY THE AWARD OF PRIZES, SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES.
Area of benefit
NORTHAMPTON.
Linked charities
- 27 November 1962 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wilson Browne Llp
Kettering Parkway
Kettering Venture Park
Kettering
NN15 6WN
- Phone:
- 01536410014
- Email:
- nmaher@wilsonbrowne.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window