THE REVEREND JOHN BECK WICKES' EXHIBITION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants towards the costs of male ordinands sponsored by the Diocese of Peterborough and educated in a school within the diocese
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Northamptonshire
- Peterborough City
- Rutland
Governance
- 16 March 1962: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew John Roberts | Trustee | 08 August 2013 |
|
|||||
Rev STEPHEN BENOY | Trustee | 08 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.15k | £1.14k | £1.13k | £1.30k | £1.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £1.13k | £1.30k | £1.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 April 2024 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES OF 10TH APRIL 1908 AND 13TH MARCH 1957
Charitable objects
THE MAINTENANCE OF A DIVINITY EXHIBITION OR EXHIBITIONS TO BE AWARDED TO YOUNG MEN INTENDING TO TAKE HOLY ORDERS IN THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
THE DIOCESE OF PETERBOROUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
DIOCESAN OFFICE
THE PALACE
MINSTER PRECINCTS
PETERBOROUGH
PE1 1YB
- Phone:
- 01733887000
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window