Financial history TONG VILLAGE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1088147
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £1.64k £18.08k £10.80k £2.56k £5.52k
Total expenditure £2.32k £2.15k £2.86k £8.72k £7.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £17.34k £10.10k N/A N/A