Financial history THE BEACON EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity Number: 309911
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £8.18m £8.02m £9.01m £9.21m £10.02m
Total expenditure £7.40m £7.50m £8.26m £8.96m £9.14m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £10.43k £0 £78.76k £46.09k £90.53k
Income - Other trading activities £73.82k £56.57k £0 £216.07k £206.15k
Income - Charitable activities £8.10m £7.96m £8.73m £8.88m £9.56m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £2.12k £5.87k £67.75k £164.26k
Income - Other £0 £0 £196.57k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.34m £7.46m £8.24m £8.89m £9.07m
Expenditure - Raising funds £58.15k £41.79k £28.09k £68.93k £76.12k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0