WALES QUALITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Corporate Membership, Training & Consultancy
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 April 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jamie Bowen | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cari-Anne Quinn | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Miers | Trustee | 25 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Daniels | Trustee | 25 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Yip | Trustee | 25 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
DENISE ANNE PHILLIPS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £251.09k | £312.01k | £412.39k | £297.88k | £225.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £239.40k | £265.55k | £288.93k | £323.36k | £249.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.27k | £22.43k | £1.57k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 APRIL 1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 5 DECEMBER 1996. CERTIFICATE UPON CHANGE OF NAME 26 JULY 1989.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF INDUSTRY AND COMMERCE THROUGHOUT WALES, AND FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF COMMERCIAL AND INDUSTRIAL PERSONNEL.
Area of benefit
WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Waterton Technology Centre
Waterton Industrial Estate
Bridgend
CF31 3WT
- Phone:
- 01656652063
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window