OLD OUNDELIAN BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the Fund are to give financial assistance to any Old Oundelian or their children at Oundle School, Laxton School or at some Preparatory School or at some recognised place of higher education. To found Scholarships, Exhibitions or Bursaries and to give financial assistance by loan or gift to any Old Oundelian or their dependants in need or in furtherance of recreational activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 25 March 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Ellis | Chair | 02 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charles Christopher John Salem | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Siddarth Chand Lall | Trustee | 04 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charles Clive Anderson | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Nicky Yianni | Trustee | 10 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alastair C H Irvine | Trustee | 07 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.91k | £14.74k | £14.82k | £25.33k | £16.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.69k | £2.91k | £2.83k | £2.71k | £2.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 08 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 23/03/1936 AS AMENDED ON 07/11/2009 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 12 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
THE SOLE PURPOSES OR OBJECTS TO OR FOR ALL OR ANY OF WHICH TRUST FUND MONEYS ARE TO BE APPLIED ARE AS FOLLOWS:- (1) TO GIVE FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ANY OLD OUNDELIAN IN THE EDUCATION OF HIS OR HER CHILD OR CHILDREN AT OUNDLE SCHOOL OR AT SOME PREPARATORY SCHOOL OR AT SOME RECOGNISED PLACE OF HIGHER EDUCATION; (2) TO FOUND SCHOLARSHIPS OR EXHIBITIONS AVAILABLE FOR OLD OUNDELIANS OR THEIR CHILDREN; (3) TO GIVE FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE BY EITHER LOAN OR GIFTS TO ANY OLD OUNDELIAN OR HIS OR HER DEPENDENTS IN NEED OR DISTRESS; (4) TO GIVE FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ANY OLD OUNDELIAN OR HIS OR HER DEPENDENTS FOR EDUCATION OR TRAINING FOR ANY BUSINESS OR PROFESSION IF CONSIDERED BY THE TRUSTEES TO BE NECESSARY OR ADVISABLE ON THE GROUNDS OF FINANCIAL NECESSITY; (5) TO CONTRIBUTE TOWARDS ANY OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECT FOR THE BENEFIT OF OLD OUNDELIANS OF THEIR DEPENDENTS PROVIDED THAT SUCH CONTRIBUTION HAS BEEN PREVIOUSLY SANCTIONED BY THE COMMITTEE OF THE OLD OUNDELIAN CLUB AFORESAID; (6) TO CONTRIBUTE TOWARDS PROJECTS OR OTHER APPEALS FOR THE FURTHER DEVELOPMENT OF OUNDLE SCHOOL FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE ABOVE THE EXPRESSION "OLD OUNDELIAN" MEANS ANY PERSON WHO WAS EDUCATED AT OUNDLE SCHOOL OR LAXTON SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cobthorne House
16 West Street
Oundle
Peterborough
PE8 4EF
- Phone:
- 01832 277 297
- Email:
- nyianni@oundleschool.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window