CHARLES NEWTON MEMORIAL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity provides flying scholarships to students who plan an aviation related career With the 15 hours training a good student should achieve solo plus additional experience It is felt that winning such a scholarship not only gives the recipient valuable aviation experience, but also adds weight to their subsequent university and career applications in a very competitive market
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 20 June 1967: Standard registration
- 12 December 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SYWELL FLYING SCHOLARSHIPS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2012 | 31/10/2013 | 31/10/2014 | 31/10/2015 | 31/10/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.50k | £540 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.11k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2016 | 14 November 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2015 | 16 February 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2014 | 15 March 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2013 | 10 May 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28TH FEBRUARY 1967
Charitable objects
THE TRAINING OF YOUNG MEN AND WOMEN AS PILOTS OF AIRCRAFT AND OTHER FYLING MACHINES. THE PROMOTION OF KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE CONSTRUCTION OF AIRCRAFT OR OF EQUIPMENT FOR USE IN CONNECTION WITH AIRCRAFT AND AVIATION GENERALLY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window