CONGLETON COMMUNICARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of transport for residents registered a with medical practice in Congleton to attend medical appointments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £8,734 from 1 government contract(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 21 November 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANET EATON | Chair | 19 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Armitt | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
DIANNE SINCLAIR | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|||||
RUTH GARNER | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Michael Tingle | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Alvarez | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rita Pennington | Trustee | 17 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Janet Whitewright | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mary Turner | Trustee | 26 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Walshaw | Trustee | 13 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
RAY BOOTH | Trustee | 06 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.16k | £27.57k | £26.19k | £36.11k | £42.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.91k | £19.58k | £19.87k | £34.03k | £35.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.73k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 NOVEMBER 1984 AS AMENDED 16 NOVEMBER 1999 AND 5 SEPTEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN CONGLETON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, BY THE PROVISION OF A TRANSPORT SERVICE IN ORDER TO HELP THEM MAINTAIN AN INDEPENDENT LIFE STYLE
Area of benefit
CONGLETON, CHESHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Holmes Chapel Road
CONGLETON
Cheshire
CW12 4NE
- Phone:
- 01260270883
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window