FUDGE HYATT AND WICKHAM CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Gives grants to organisations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Somerset
Governance
- 22 April 1982: Standard registration
- 09 December 2014: Removed (Does not operate)
- 21 January 2015: Re-registered
- 06 June 2018: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 06 June 2018: Funds transferred to 1130891 THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL...
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2012 | 30/06/2013 | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | 19 August 2017 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2015 | 18 November 2016 | 202 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2014 | 10 June 2015 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 22 APRIL 1982.
Charitable objects
PROMOTING RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY MEANS OF A SUNDAY SCHOOL OR IN ANY MANNER THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER AND ST PAUL SHEPTON MALLET
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window