HEBBURN NEIGHBOURHOOD ADVICE CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is currently in the process of being dissolved
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- South Tyneside
Governance
- 27 September 2005: Standard registration
- 17 March 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- HEBBURN ADVICE CENTRE (Working name)
- HEBNAC (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £114.96k | £108.29k | £88.38k | £95.95k | £30.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £110.39k | £93.59k | £105.22k | £106.03k | £15.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 28 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 28 January 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 23 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 28 May 2014 | 117 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 20 November 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 27 November 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 10 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 11 October 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 OCTOBER 2004 AS AMENDED 7 JULY 2005.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, DISABILITY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF FREE ADVICE AND INFORMATION SERVICES CONCERNED WITH A WIDE RANGE OF ISSUES AFFECTING PERSONAL AND FAMILY WELL BEING INCLUDING WELFARE RIGHTS, ADVOCACY, REPRESENTATION AND INFORMATION REGARDING SERVICES PROVIDED BY OTHER ORGANISATIONS AND BODIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE. HEBBURN, SOUTH TYNESIDE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window