KEYFORD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide young people living in and around the Frome area under the age of 25 years in full-time education with financial assistance for educational purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Somerset
Governance
- 05 November 1962: Standard registration
- KEYFORD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION (INCORP THE ANCIENT BLUE COAT SCHOOL FOUNDATION) (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Agnes Macleay | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE MARY SALMON | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Dowling | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Oakes | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARIE-LOUISE MACLEAY | Trustee | 24 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANDREA BROOKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.98k | £1.53k | £1.87k | £2.03k | £2.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.57k | £383 | £341 | £1.61k | £480 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 November 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES OF THE 9TH JULY 1957 AND 8TH DECEMBER 1975
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES MAY APPLY SUCH YEARLY SUM AS THEY THINK FIT BEING NOT MORE THEN ONE-HALF OF THE SAID NET INCOME IN PROVIDING SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR FROME COLLEGE AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE AGREED BETWEEN THE AUTHORITY AND THE GOVERNORS. THE RESIDUE OF THE NET INCOME FOR THE BENEFIT OF FEMALE PERSONS WHO HAVE NOT ATTAINED THE AGE OF 25 YEARS AND ARE RESIDENT IN THE ANCIENT PARISH OF FROME IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS:- A) THE AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS BURSARIES OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR OTHER PLACES OR LEARNING APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES; B) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS OR BOOKS; C) THE AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO TRAVEL ABROAD TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION; D) THE PROVISION, OR ASSISTANCE TOWARDS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY; E) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO STUDY MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF FROME
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE BLUE HOUSE
THE BRIDGE
FROME
SOMERSET
BA11 1AP
- Phone:
- 01373462577
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window