Accounts and annual returns THE BEAVERBROOK FOUNDATION

Charity number: 310003
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 27 March 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2015 27 April 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2014 16 March 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2014 16 March 2015 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2013 13 February 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2013 13 February 2014 On Time