Financial history NORTHUMBRIA YOUTH ACTION LIMITED

Charity number: 1064098
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £411.89k £467.42k £454.83k £465.73k £449.91k
Total expenditure £466.96k £492.71k £524.95k £492.38k £473.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £31.25k £61.99k £400 N/A N/A