ROYAL ACADEMY OF MUSIC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide pre-professional, undergraduate and postgraduate musical training of the highest national and international standards.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£37,506,000
Donations and legacies | £14.90m | |
Charitable activities | £18.91m | |
Other trading activities | £528.00k | |
Investments | £1.16m | |
Other | £2.01m |
Total expenditure:
£30,331,000
Raising funds | £1.31m | |
Charitable activities | £29.03m | |
Other | £0 |
£7,898,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £5,806,000 from 6 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.31m | |
Charitable expenditure | £29.03m | |
Retained for future use | £7.18m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.31m | |
Charitable expenditure | £29.03m | |
Retained for future use | £15.07m |
People

248 Employee(s)
17 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 7 |
£70k to £80k | 9 |
£80k to £90k | 5 |
£90k to £100k | 4 |
£100k to £110k | 4 |
£110k to £120k | 4 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 2 |
£250k to £300k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 January 1973: Standard registration
- R A M (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Sir Wayne MCGREGOR | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|||||||
Dr Christopher Philip Robert White | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Jonathan Freeman-Attwood | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Sir SIMON CHRISTOPHER TOWNSEND ROBEY | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|||||||
Peter Hesketh | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|||||||
Dinah Rose | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|||||||
Andrew Hamish Forsyth | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||||
Tiffany Qiu | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Gemma Waring | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Ina De | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||||
Alexis Alexander Ffrench | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Duchess Antonia Wellington OBE | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
REHMET KASSIM LAKHA DE MORIXE | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Lord Blackwell | Trustee | 27 March 2017 |
|
|
||||||
WILLIAM MICHAEL JEFFERIES DE WINTON | Trustee | 25 October 2016 |
|
|||||||
DAMIAN WISNIEWSKI | Trustee | 06 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN BURGESS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.41m | £30.07m | £32.58m | £32.53m | £33.50m | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.96m | £24.53m | £26.48m | £29.47m | £30.33m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £5.01m | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.20m | £5.01m | £5.54m | £6.22m | £5.81m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £11.99m | £12.77m | £13.67m | £11.18m | £14.90m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £463.00k | £528.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £10.86m | £15.70m | £16.77m | £18.41m | £18.91m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £754.70k | £7.03m | £4.22m | £4.44m | £4.00m | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.37m | £947.07k | £834.10k | £1.24m | £1.16m | |
|
Income - Other | £1.93m | £664.11k | £1.31m | £1.24m | £2.01m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £2.08m | £3.89m | £4.38m | £2.64m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £24.02m | £23.79m | £25.56m | £28.39m | £29.03m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £940.40k | £742.00k | £923.43k | £1.08m | £1.31m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £92.82k | £80.26k | £65.00k | £174.14k | £98.27k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £164.53k | £671.08k | £671.00k | £0 | £116.05k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £121.95m | £144.92m | £143.99m | £144.36m | £144.47m | |
|
Long-term investments | £41.99m | £49.49m | £51.27m | £67.74m | £75.69m | |
|
Other assets | £13.31m | £21.21m | £26.26m | £13.91m | £20.66m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£5.16m | -£4.04m | -£1.87m | -£572.00k | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £3.31m | £4.56m | £3.77m | £4.14m | £4.15m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER LETTERS PATENT OF 23 JUNE 1830 AND SCHEME OF 27 DECEMBER 1990 AND AMENDED 20 JULY 1998
Charitable objects
THE CULTIVATION OF THE SCIENCE OF MUSIC AND TO AFFORD FACILITIES FOR ATTAINING PERFECTION IN IT BY ASSISTING WITH GENERAL INSTRUCTION ALL PERSONS DESIROUS OF ACQUIRING A KNOWLEDGE THEREOF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- ADA LEWIS SCHOLARSHIPS
- AGNES ZIMMERMAN GIFT
- ALAN MURRAY SCHOLARSHIP
- ALBANESI PRIZE
- ALESSANDRO PEZZE PRIZE
- ALEXANDER ROLLER MEMORIAL PRIZE
- ALFRED GIBSON MEMORIAL PRIZE
- ALFRED J WALEY PRIZE
- ANDREW SYKES SCHOLARSHIP
- ANNE E LLOYD EXHIBITION
- ANNIE M CHILD SCHOLARSHIP
- ARTHUR HERVEY SCHOLARSHIP
- ARTHUR HINTON MEMORIAL PRIZE
- BACH AND BEETHOVEN SCHOLARSHIPS
- BACHE MEMORIAL ENDOWMENT FUND
- BATTISON HAYNES PRIZE
- BAUME MANX SCHOLARSHIP
- BENNETT OF LINCOLN MEMORIAL FUND
- BLACKISTON MEMORIAL PRIZE
- BLUMENTHAL SCHOLARSHIP
- BROUGHTON PACKER BATH SCHOLARSHIPS
- CAMPBELL CLARKE SCHOLARSHIP
- CECIL MARTIN PRIZE
- CHARLES LUCAS MEMORIAL FUND
- CHARLES WILLIAM BLACK TRUST STUDENT FELLOWSHIP
- CHARLOTTE WALTERS PRIZE
- CONSTANCE GOETZE BEQUEST
- CUTHBERT WHITEMORE MEMORIAL PRIZE
- DAVID CARL TAYLOR MEMORIAL FUND
- DOVE SCHOLARSHIP AND DOVE ANNUAL PRIZE
- D'OYLY CARTE MEMORIAL FUND
- E F JAMES MEMORIAL PRIZE
- EDA KERSEY MEMORIAL EXHIBITION
- EDITH MARY LEE FUND
- EDWARD AND ANNE SEGUIN SCHOLARSHIP
- EDWARD CUTHBERT NUNN MEMORIAL PRIZE
- EDWARD HECHT PRIZE
- EDWARD W NICHOLLS PRIZE
- ELSIE HORNE GIFT
- ELSIE OWEN PRIZE
- EMILY FOXCROFT SCHOLARSHIP FOR ENGLISH-BORD CONTRACTUS
- EMMA LEVY SCHOLARSHIP
- EMMELINE LYELL-TAYLOR SCHOLARSHIP
- ERIC BROUGH MEMORIAL FUND
- ERIC COATES PRIZE FOR COMPOSITION
- ERNEST JOSEPH TEBBUTT EXHIBITION
- ERNEST READ PRIZE
- ETHEL KENNEDY-JACOBS FUND
- F G FITCH BEQUEST
- FANNY ELIZA BECKETT SCHOLARSHIP
- FRANK WALTER AND WINIFRED BLANCHE FAULKNER SCHOLARSHIP
- FRED WALKER SCHOLARSHIP AND PRIZE
- FREDERICK ANDREW KEENE PRIZE
- FREDERICK CORDER PRIZE
- FREDERICK G SHINN PRIZE FOR THE HISTORY OF MUSIC
- FREDERICK WESTLAKE MEMORIAL PRIZE
- GEORGE MENCE-SMITH SCHOLARSHIP
- GILBERT BETJEMANN MEMORIAL PRIZE
- GOLDBERG PRIZE
- GORING THOMAS SCHOLARSHIP
- GOWLAND HARRISON BEQUEST
- GRABOWSKY-CONNELL SCHOLARSHIP
- GUILIA GRISI PRIZE OR MARIO EXHIBITION OR PRIZE
- GWYNNE KIMPTON MEMORIAL SCHOLARSHIP
- H E LEES PRIZE
- HAROLD SAMUEL BACH PRIZE
- HARRIET CLAIBORNE DIXON TRUST
- HARRIET KENDALL PRIZE
- HARRY FARJEON PRIZE FUND
- HARVEY LOHR FUND
- HELEN EAMES SCHOLARSHIP
- HENDERSON SCHOLARSHIPS
- HENRY R EYERS PRIZE
- HENRY SMART SCHOLARSHIP
- HERBERT WALENN PRIZE
- HINE PRIZE OR GIFT
- HUBERT KIVER PRIZE
- HUGH B FITCH PRIZE
- ISABEL JOY MEMORIAL PRIZE
- ISABELLA LUCAS PRIZE
- J AND J BROUGH PRIZE
- JANET DUFF GREET PRIZE
- JOHN B MCEWAN PRIZE FOR STRING QUARTET PLAYING
- JOHN E WEST PRIZE
- JOHN THOMAS (WELSH) SCHOLARSHIP
- JOSEPH MAAS MEMORIAL PRIZE
- JOSEPHINE TROUP SCHOLARSHIP
- JULIA LENEY PRIZE
- JULIET EMILY RECKITT FUND
- KATE STEELE MEMORIAL PRIZE
- KATIE THOMAS MEMORIAL FUND
- LADY JENKINSON'S THALBERG SCHOLARSHIP
- LADY M BULL SCHOLARSHIP
- LADY WALLIS BUDGE PRIZE
- LENA SOPHIA BEATRICE PRITCHARD GREENE FUND
- LEONARD BORWICK PRIZE
- LESLEY ALEXANDER GIFT
- LILIAN ADA FOOTE BEQUEST
- LILIAN DAVIES PRIZE
- LILIAN ELDEE SCHOLARSHIP
- LIONEL MONCKTON SCHOLARSHIP OR PRIZE
- LISZT SCHOLARSHIP WITH WHICH IS INCORPORATED THE BACHE SCHOLARSHIP
- LOUISA BANERJEI PRIZE
- MACFARREN SCHOLARSHIP
- MANNS MEMORIAL PRIZE
- MARY BURGESS MEMORIAL FUND
- MATTHEW PHILLIMORE PRIZE
- MAUD HORNSBY MEMORIAL PRIZE
- MAUD MARY GOOCH SCHOLARSHIP
- MICHAEL COSTA SCHOLARSHIP
- MINNIE HAWK BEQUEST
- MOIR CARNEGIE PRIZE FOR VIOLIN AND VIOLIN CELLO
- MRS EDITH MAUD MILES BEQULEST
- NAT AND OLIVE EDWARDS SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- NESTA JENNINGS CAMPBELL TRUST
- NORA NAISMITH SCHOLARSHIP
- NORTH LONDON ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY MEMORIAL PRIZE
- OLDHAM SCHOLARSHIP
- OLIVERIA LOUISA PRESCOTT GIFT
- OPRATORIO PRIZE
- PAREPA ROSA PRIZE
- PAREPA ROSE SCHOLARSHIP
- PARKER BEQUEST
- PHILIP AGNEW TRUST AID FUND
- PHILLIP AGNEW FUND
- PHOEE A S POULETT SCHOLARSHIP
- PIANOFORTE PROFESSORS MEMORIAL PRIZE
- POTTER EXHIBITION
- REVIEW WEEK PRIZE
- RIDLEY PRENTICE MEMORIAL PRIZE
- ROSE DAFFORNE BEQUEST
- ROSS SCHOLARSHIPS
- ROTH PRIZE
- ROWSBY WOOF PRIZE
- ROWSBY WOOF SCHOLARSHIP
- ROYAL ACADEMY OF MUSIC PRINCIPAL'S ENDOWMENT FUND FOR AWARDS
- ROYAL ACADEMY OF MUSIC PRINCIPAL'S ENDOWMENT FUND FOR BURSARIES
- ROYAL ACADEMY OF MUSIC PRINCIPAL'S ENDOWMENT FUND FOR SCHOLARSHIPS
- ROYAL ACADEMY OF MUSIC PRINCIPAL'S JUNIOR ENDOWMENT FUND
- RUTSON PRIZE
- SAINTON DOLBY MEMORIAL FUND
- SAINTON SCHOLARSHIP
- SAMUEL AND MARY EYRES WILSON SCHOLARSHIP
- SIR EDWARD COOPER PRIZE
- SIR JOHN GOSS EXHIBITION
- SISSELLE WRAY SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- STERNDALE BENNETT SCHOLARSHIP AND THE STERNDALE BENNETT PRIZE
- STEWART MACPHERSON PRIZE
- STOKE BEQUEST
- STUDENTS' AID FUND
- SWANSEA EISTEDFORD PRIZE
- THE KING GEORGE VI CORONATION SCHOLARSHIP FOR ORCHESTRAL INSTRUMENTS
- THE LADY HOLLAND AND THODORE HOLLAND FUND
- THOMAS C FITTON WILL TRUST (HOVIS PRIZE)
- THOMAS JENNINGS EXHIBITION
- THOMAS THRELFALL SCHOLARSHIP
- TITIENS FUND (ERSKINE BEQUEST)
- TUER SCHOLARSHIP
- W A RICHARDS MEMORIAL PRIZE
- WALTER MACFARREN MEDALS
- WESTMORLAND SCHOLARSHIP
- WILLIAM ELKING MEMORIAL FUND
- WILLIAM ROBERT SHAW EXHIBITION
- WILLIAM TOWNSEND SCHOLARSHIP
- WILLIAM WALLACE SCHOLARSHIP
- WILLIE B MANSON FUND
- WILTON COLE PRIZE FOR ELOCUTION
- WINIFRED CHRISTIE SCHOLARSHIP
- 04 January 1973 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROYAL ACADEMY OF MUSIC
MARYLEBONE ROAD
LONDON
NW1 5HT
- Phone:
- 02078737309
- Email:
- Financeteam@ram.ac.uk
- Website:
-
ram.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window