Haileybury College

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Haileybury is a boarding and day school for children aged 11-19. The ethos of Haileybury is centred around giving pupils a first class academic education whilst at the same time offering an exceptional pastoral environment and a broad choice of co-curricular activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£32,273,000
Donations and legacies | £237.00k | |
Charitable activities | £29.82m | |
Other trading activities | £1.89m | |
Investments | £330.00k | |
Other | £1.00k |
Total expenditure:
£31,163,000
Raising funds | £285.00k | |
Charitable activities | £30.10m | |
Other | £781.00k |
-£245,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.07m | |
Charitable expenditure | £30.10m | |
Retained for future use | £1.11m |
People

436 Employee(s)
18 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 16 |
£70k to £80k | 7 |
£80k to £90k | 3 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 2 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
£200k to £250k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- HAILEYBURY (Working name)
- HAILEYBURY AND IMPERIAL SERVICE COLLEGE (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Rayfield BSc Econ | Chair | 04 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Charles Luckock | Trustee | 08 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine McKenna | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Phelps KC | Trustee | 04 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rebecca Olowookere MRCGP | Trustee | 04 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Toral PANDYA BSc | Trustee | 04 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Grimberg LLB | Trustee | 04 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Alexander Peters | Trustee | 07 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
William Walker-Arnott | Trustee | 07 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Alexander Drewett | Trustee | 07 December 2018 |
|
|||||
Timothy Ivan Page-Ratcliff | Trustee | 07 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
GERALD ELLISON MA | Trustee | 08 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Alker Westley | Trustee | 08 December 2017 |
|
|||||
NICHOLAS GILBERT BA | Trustee | 09 December 2016 |
|
|||||
Stephen Roberts MA | Trustee | 09 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD MADDEN MA ACA | Trustee | 18 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD MUNN MA CANTAB | Trustee | 07 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr NIGEL RICHARDSON MA PHD | Trustee | 17 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.17m | £25.67m | £26.89m | £30.22m | £32.27m | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.42m | £26.18m | £25.64m | £29.05m | £31.16m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £587.00k | £906.00k | £588.00k | £970.00k | £237.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.03m | £1.02m | £1.80m | £1.33m | £1.89m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £23.77m | £23.21m | £24.15m | £27.56m | £29.82m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £738.00k | £475.00k | £342.00k | £362.00k | £330.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £45.00k | £58.00k | £10.00k | £3.00k | £1.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £265.00k | £650.00k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £23.75m | £25.47m | £25.20m | £28.57m | £30.10m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £165.00k | £263.00k | £200.00k | £290.00k | £285.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £294.00k | £332.00k | £359.00k | £278.96k | £39.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £54.00k | £113.00k | £96.00k | £116.00k | £96.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £505.00k | £440.00k | £240.00k | £183.00k | £781.00k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £34.82m | £36.40m | £39.65m | £43.39m | £56.73m | |
|
Long-term investments | £19.52m | £19.00m | £22.74m | £20.61m | £14.43m | |
|
Other assets | £12.32m | £15.83m | £13.98m | £11.63m | £7.52m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £7.97m | £13.59m | £13.82m | £14.12m | £16.32m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 18 June 2020 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 18 June 2020 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 30 AUG 1864 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 20 JUL 1929 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 12 JAN 1943 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 14 JUN 2000 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 14 DEC 2022
Charitable objects
TO CARRY ON AND MAINTAIN THE COLLEGE PROVIDED THAT COUNCIL MAY, WITHOUT LIMITATION, PURSUE THESE OBJECTS BY CARRYING ON ONE OR MORE COLLEGES OR SCHOOLS ON ONE OR MORE SITES, AND BY MAKING GRANTS IN SUPPORT OF ONE OR MORE COLLEGES OR SCHOOLS PROVIDED THAT ANY SUCH COLLEGE OR SCHOOL SHALL IN THEIR OPINION BE CONNECTED OR ASSOCIATED WITH THE COLLEGE AND FURTHER SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS IN THE OPINION OF COUNCIL ASSOCIATED WITH THE COLLEGE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- ALICE WERNHER SCHOLARSHIPS
- ARCHIBALD SCOTT DEBENHAM SCHOLARSHIP
- ARTHUR BUTLER SCHOLARSHIP
- ASHCROFT MEMORIAL FUND
- ASSISTANT MASTERS' RETIREMENT FUND
- ERNEST CHAPMAN BURSARY
- FAIR HANCOCK SWEET ESCOTT SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- FARINGDON FUND
- GOLDSMID FUND
- HAILEYBURY AND IMPERIAL SERVICE COLLEGE EXHIBITION SCHOLARSHIP AND PRIZE FUND
- HAILEYBURY AND IMPERIAL SERVICE COLLEGE JUNIOR SCHOOL SWIMMING POOL FUND
- HAILEYBURY CENTENARY APPEAL FUND
- IMPERIAL SERVICE ENDOWMENT
- KIPLING SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- LESLIE WILKINSON SCHOLARSHIP
- MASTERS EXHIBITION FUND (OTHERWISE THE TROUGHTON EXHIBITION FUND)
- ORMSLEY FUND
- PATRICK ALEXANDER TRUST
- PAUL KING MEMORIAL SCHOLARSHIP
- PHILIP RAYNSFORD LONGMORE REQUEST
- PRINCESS ALICE SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- RALPH SCOTT-WILLEY MEMORIAL EXHIBITION
- RALPH WENTWORTH EVERS SCHOLARSHIP
- REGINALD ABEL SMITH BEQUEST
- THE HAILEYBURY CHARITABLE TRUST
- WAR MEMORIAL FUND
- WARREN WOOD EXHIBITIONS
- 26 February 1964 : Standard registration
- 10 March 2004 : Removed
- 10 March 2004 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE BURSARY
HAILEYBURY COLLEGE
HERTFORD
SG13 7NU
- Phone:
- 01992 706497
- Email:
- c.mills@haileybury.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window