CHESTER AND NANTWICH ADVANCED DRIVERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Group's primary function is to provide Associates with the opportunity to improve their standard of car driving to the level necessary to pass the IAM's Advanced Driving Test.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Flintshire
- Wrexham
Governance
- 01 February 2006: Standard registration
- 14 December 2017: Funds received from 1059553 CREWE AND NANTWICH ADVANCED MOTORISTS
- CANAD (Working name)
- CHESTER AND DISTRICT ADVANCED MOTORISTS (Previous name)
- CHESTER AND EAST CLWYD GROUP OF ADVANCED MOTORISTS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benjamin Harrison | Chair | 14 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Darlington | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gary Whittaker | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deryck William Petty | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Farrell | Trustee | 17 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Denis Wildey Sinstadt | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Philip Brown | Trustee | 03 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Robert Jones | Trustee | 02 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.22k | £1.16k | £620 | £756 | £1.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.46k | £609 | £308 | £1.27k | £1.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11/10/2005 AS AMENDED ON 20/07/2014 AS AMENDED ON 26 SEP 2017
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE STANDARD OF DRIVING AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF ROAD SAFETY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
IAM Roadsmart
Albany Way
Hyde Way
WELWYN GARDEN CITY
Hertfordshire
AL7 3BT
- Phone:
- 0845 009 5399
- Email:
- info@canad.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window