Trustees CHESTER AND NANTWICH ADVANCED DRIVERS
Charity number: 1112887

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benjamin Harrison | Chair | 14 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Darlington | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gary Whittaker | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deryck William Petty | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Farrell | Trustee | 17 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Denis Wildey Sinstadt | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Philip Brown | Trustee | 03 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Robert Jones | Trustee | 02 April 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.