NEW COLLEGE LONDON FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 310027
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Income distributed to four constituent bodies congregational and URC.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,393
Total expenditure: £60

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 January 1962: Standard registration
  • 19 August 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
THE CONGREGATIONAL FEDERATION LIMITED Trustee
MANSE FOR THE MINISTER OF DRIFFIELD CONGREGATIONAL CHURCH
Received: On time
UNITED REFORMED CHURCH TRUST Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £178 £35 £12 £515 £1.39k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £15 £60 £60
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 22 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 18 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 25 MARCH 1981 AS AMENDED ON THE 14TH SEPTEMBER 2007 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER SECTION 75 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 8 OCTOBER 2007
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE APPLIED IN AUGMENTATION OF THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY CALLED THE NEW COLLEGE LONDON FOUNDATION. (IE. THE TRAINING OF MEN AND WOMEN FOR THE CHRISTIAN MINISTRY PARTICULARLY FOR MINISTRY IN THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH. )
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 28 January 1962 : Standard registration
  • 19 August 2009 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
8 CASTLE GATE
NOTTINGHAM
NG1 7AS
Phone:
01159111460
Website:

No information available