RICHMOND HILL ELDERLY ACTION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leeds City
Governance
- 22 April 1997: Standard registration
- 12 July 2006: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 12 July 2006: Funds transferred to 1114792 RICHMOND HILL ELDERLY ACTION LIMITED
- RHEA (Working name)
- RICHMOND HILL ELDERLY AID (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.25k | £68.62k | £72.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.11k | £53.53k | £77.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 31 July 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 22 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 22 November 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 08 September 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 19 November 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 JANUARY 1995 AS AMENDED 20 MARCH 1996 22 JANUARY 1997, 23RD SEPTEMBER 1999 AND 7 JULY 2005
Charitable objects
THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED FOR; 1) THE PROMOTION OF THE WELFARE OF THE ELDERLY RESIDENTS IN THE RICHMOND HILL AREA OF LEEDS IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED TO BE CHARITABLE IN LAW AND IN PARTICULAR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONGST SUCH PERSONS; 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE ELDERLY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN RELATION TO FINANCIAL, HEALTH, HOUSING AND WELFARE ENTITLEMENTS; 3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, PROMOTION OF RESEARCH CONCERNING THE NEEDS OF THE ELDERLY IN RELATION TO THE PROVISIONS OF FUEL, HEAT AND LIGHT, AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
THE RICHMOND HILL AREA OF THE CITY OF LEEDS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window