FRIENDS OF ALMA PARK PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE ASSOCIATION EXISTS TO SUPPORT CHILDREN AT ALMA PARK SCHOOL BY FUNDRAISING TO PROVIDE FACILITES OR EQUIPMENT AND TO DEVELOP STAFF AND PARENT/ CARER/FAMILY RELAITONSHIPS THROUGH SOCIAL AND FUNDRAISING EVENTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Manchester City
Governance
- 22 March 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hannah Magowan | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Power | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bruce Woods | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Octavia Gilmour | Trustee | 18 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sadiya Akram | Trustee | 18 February 2023 |
|
|||||
LAURA DAWSON | Trustee | 28 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £832 | £0 | £1.87k | £3.14k | £2.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.48k | £1.59k | £542 | £140 | £153 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 February 2024 | 231 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 January 2023 | 194 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 February 2022 | 233 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02/04/2001 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 19/05/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS;
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE ALMA PARK PRIMARY SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Alma Park Primary School
Errwood Road
MANCHESTER
M19 2PF
- Phone:
- 0161 224 8789
- Email:
- almaparkpta@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window