CALVARY TRUE GOSPEL CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is a Christian church with a mandate to proclaim the gospel of Jesus Christ. Activities include: Classes for elderly; Day centre activities, youth events & other social/cultural events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 05 June 1997: Standard registration
- 27 August 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 06 October 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev GEORGE ROSS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Mo Ross | Trustee | 31 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Ross | Trustee | 31 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Sanders | Trustee | 31 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.95k | £3.54k | £8.71k | £16.30k | £16.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.59k | £2.16k | £5.32k | £4.78k | £21.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 13 June 2024 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 12 June 2024 | 378 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 12 June 2024 | 743 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 AUGUST 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Crocketts Lane
Smethwick
West Midlands
B66 3BE
- Phone:
- 07886718215
- Email:
- admin@amoebaassociates.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window