Financial history THE CHEW STOKE EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 310070
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.04k £11.36k £12.37k £11.00k £21.70k
Total expenditure £4.89k £5.01k £13.38k £1.32k £40.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A