Trustees HILL MILLOM VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 1105248

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Parsons | Chair | 09 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Rigg | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Moore | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Roger Sutton | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Marianna Benn | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neil Anderson | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
SARAH GUMZ | Trustee | 02 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALAN SHARPE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.