Financial history THE EDWARD ROSE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1074447
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £148.69k £74.68k £47.72k £46.88k £46.90k
Total expenditure £36.31k £19.18k £28.65k £15.04k £28.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A