Financial history PLUMLEYS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 310078
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £87 £84 £83 £77 £79
Total expenditure £85 £86 £85 £83 £76
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A