WHITCHURCH COMMUNITY SERVICES ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1073546
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Healthy cooking Computer classes Youth sessions exercise classes art & craft sessions counselling Walking for Health Community choir Rural community outreach work

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 28 February 2021

Total income: £116,697
Total expenditure: £150,998

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Shropshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 January 1999: Standard registration
  • 15 September 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
  • 15 September 2022: Funds transferred to 1153274 WHITCHURCH FOODBANK
  • 15 September 2022: Funds transferred to 1129900 THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL...
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • WHITCHURCH COMMUNITY SERVICE CENTRE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £105.32k £250.55k £279.56k £279.56k £116.70k
Total expenditure £126.19k £222.38k £240.80k £24.80k £151.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £450 £78.24k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2021 23 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 December 2021 On Time
Annual return 29 February 2020 24 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 December 2020 On Time
Annual return 28 February 2019 31 December 2019 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 December 2019 3 days late