THE UNITED KINGDOM SOCIETY FOR TRENCHLESS TECHNOLOGY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity attains its objectives by holding its own meetings and attending meetings of other societies which allow for an interchange of ideas regarding Trenchless technology.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

19 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 29 April 1997: Standard registration
- U.K.S.T.T. (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Guilliatt | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Frank Sweeney | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jason William Barnes | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Howard | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tim Sargent | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Iain Naismith | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jason Smith | Trustee | 27 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roger Wahl | Trustee | 27 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Henley | Trustee | 27 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jill Tickle | Trustee | 27 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leon Woods | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andy Gundry | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Butterworth | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Phil Steele | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAWN GREIG | Trustee | 17 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
IAN RAMSAY | Trustee | 09 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
JIM ALBARELLA | Trustee | 09 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
SHAUNA HERRON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CLAIRE NICOLE GOWDY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.91k | £57.44k | £77.66k | £132.22k | £117.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.64k | £69.94k | £82.56k | £94.55k | £125.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 November 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 November 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 November 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 November 2021 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 November 2020 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 November 2020 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 MAY 1994
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE SCIENCE AND PRACTICE OF TRENCHLESS TECHNOLOGY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT MEANING TECHNOLOGY FOR SERVICING, RENOVATION AND REPLACEMENT OF EXISTING AND THE CONTRIBUTION OF NEW PUBLIC UTILITIES AND OTHER SERVICE UNDERGROUND. B) TO PROMOTE EDUCATION, TRAINING, STUDY AND RESEARCH IN THE SAID SCIENCE AND PRACTICE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
UKSTT
200 Drake Street
ROCHDALE
Lancashire
OL16 1PJ
- Phone:
- 07745781500
- Email:
- admin@ukstt.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window