Trustees THE UNITED KINGDOM SOCIETY FOR TRENCHLESS TECHNOLOGY
Charity number: 1062142

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Guilliatt | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Frank Sweeney | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jason William Barnes | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Howard | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tim Sargent | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Iain Naismith | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jason Smith | Trustee | 27 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roger Wahl | Trustee | 27 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Henley | Trustee | 27 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jill Tickle | Trustee | 27 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leon Woods | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andy Gundry | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Butterworth | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Phil Steele | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAWN GREIG | Trustee | 17 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
IAN RAMSAY | Trustee | 09 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
JIM ALBARELLA | Trustee | 09 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
SHAUNA HERRON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CLAIRE NICOLE GOWDY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.