BIDDULPH MOOR VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO MAINTAIN THE VILLAGE HALL FOR THE COMMUNAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGE AND IT'S SURROUNDINGS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 11 April 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Cooper | Trustee | 05 February 2025 |
|
|||||
David Jukes | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY DYCHE CHAIR | Trustee | 10 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT ANDREW SIMS treasurer | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
JULIE JONES | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER ANN DULSON VICE CHAIR | Trustee | 08 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL WILLIAM LEWIS | Trustee | 01 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
MRS JACKIE NEVILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GRAHAM EARDLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.76k | £40.71k | £33.03k | £33.22k | £24.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.66k | £28.89k | £46.75k | £43.80k | £21.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.40k | £20.60k | £3.57k | £200 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 03 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 03 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19/05/75
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF BIDDULPH MOOR,STAFFORDSHIRE
Area of benefit
BIDDULPH MOOR, STAFFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Rudyard Road
Biddulph Moor
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST8 7JD
- Phone:
- 07966298591
- Email:
- tonydyche@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window