Financial history OUR LADY QUEEN OF MARTYRS PTFA

Charity number: 1061301
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £6.02k £542 £7.79k £6.69k £13.38k
Total expenditure £10.77k £1.74k £6.16k £7.74k £10.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A