Financial history FRIENDS OF KINETON C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1062157
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £10.34k £8.80k £10.02k £13.25k £14.47k
Total expenditure £20.20k £5.48k £8.83k £13.27k £9.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A