THE BILLY FRYER TRUST FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of poverty, sickness or the distress arising therefrom. The advancement of education, religion and other charitable purposes for inhabitants of the area of benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 25 September 1997: Standard registration
- 03 February 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BILLY FRYER TRUST FUND (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 21 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 22 May 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 22 May 2014 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12 FEBRUARY 1997
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS OR THE DISTRESS ARISING, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION AND FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
FERENSWAY, ANLABY ROAD, BOULEVARD, HESSLE ROAD AND CLIVE SULLIVAN WAY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window